Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/13/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/13/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/18/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/19/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/24/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/05/2006