Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/25/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/25/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/25/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/15/2006