Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/24/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/24/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/27/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/15/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/06/2006