Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/13/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/27/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/15/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2006