Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/13/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/13/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/20/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/26/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/26/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/26/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/26/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/27/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/12/2006