Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/13/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/13/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/20/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/28/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/07/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/07/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/21/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/21/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/15/2006