Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/16/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/16/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/16/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/08/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/11/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/11/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/11/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2005