Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/18/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/12/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/20/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/20/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/20/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/13/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/05/2006