Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/19/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/20/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/25/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/06/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/26/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/26/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/27/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/27/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/15/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/15/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/07/2006