Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/19/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/26/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/27/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2006