Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/20/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2006