Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/14/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/14/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/14/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/28/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/28/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/06/2006