There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Physician Payment Reform and Quality Improvement Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles XI and XVIII of the Social Security Act to reform physician payment under the Medicare Program, to modernize the quality improvement organization (QIO) program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
09/13/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6526-6532)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6275-6276)
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/28/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6022-6023)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/07/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/07/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/14/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/14/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/26/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/26/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/28/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/29/2006
Rep. Sekula Gibbs, Shelley [R-TX-22] 11/15/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/06/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/24/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/01/2006 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/24/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5866.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5866. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/2006)

Medicare Physician Payment Reform and Quality Improvement Act of 2006 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to revise physician payment requirements under the Medicare program, including the physician payment update and quality measures for physicians' services.

Terminates application of the sustainable growth rate (SGR), replacing it with a single conversion factor, the Medicare economic index (MEI) minus 1%.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide for the selection of quality performance measures (Q-measures) for assessing physician, non-physician practitioner, and supplier services and determining ratings for them. Requires such Q-measures to be developed in conjunction with physician specialty organizations and consensus-building organizations.

Eliminates specified limitations on the balance billing of highest income beneficiaries.

Revises requirements for the quality improvement program (QIO), including program administration, data disclosure, use of evaluation and competition, quality improvement funding, and qualifications for QIOs under part B (Peer Review) of SSA title XI.

Amends SSA title XIX (Medicaid) to permit alternative quality improvement programs under such program.

Terminates the availability of funds from the MA Regional Plan Stabilization Fund.

Directs the Board of Trustees of the Federal Hospital Insurance Trust Fund and of the Federal Supplementary Medical Insurance Trust Fund to monitor and examine the extent to which the different Medicare funding mechanisms provide an appropriate alignment with the program goals of the respective parts.

Provides for a one-year delay in Medicare adjustments in payments for imaging services.

Eliminates the three-year phase-in for implementation of the reduction in Medicare part B premium subsidies for higher income beneficiaries (thus requiring immediate application of the reduction adjustment).