Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/24/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/07/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/07/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/14/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/14/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/26/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/26/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/28/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/29/2006
Rep. Sekula Gibbs, Shelley [R-TX-22] 11/15/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/06/2006