Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/02/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/13/2006