Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/10/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/02/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/23/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/14/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/14/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/08/2005