Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/12/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/13/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/28/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 11/13/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/13/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/13/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/13/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/14/2006