Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/27/2006