Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/21/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/26/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/26/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/28/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2006