Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/06/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/13/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/13/2006