Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/27/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/26/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2006