Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/27/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/19/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/14/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/05/2006