There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cord Blood Stem Cell Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a National Cord Blood Stem Cell Bank Network to prepare, store, and distribute human umbilical cord blood stem cells for the treatment of patients and to support peer-reviewed research using such cells.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/25/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/02/2005Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/27/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/19/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/19/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/02/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/25/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2005)

Cord Blood Stem Cell Act of 2005 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Administrator of the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA), to enter into contracts with qualified cord blood stem cell banks to assist in establishing and maintaining a National Network of Cord Blood Stem Cell Banks to: (1) acquire, tissue type, test, cryopreserve, and store donated units of human cord blood acquired with the informed consent of the donor; (2) make cord blood units available to transplant centers for stem cell transplantations; and (3) allocate up to 10 percent of the cord blood inventory each year for peer-reviewed research. Requires the Secretary to provide for the establishment of a Board of Directors to administer the Network.

Directs the Secretary, acting through the Administrator, to establish as part of the Network a National Cord Blood Stem Cell Registry to: (1) operate a system for identifying, acquiring, and distributing donated units of cord blood; (2) provide health care professionals with the ability to search the registry for suitable matches for patients; and (3) maintain a database to document the collection, storage, distribution, and transplantation of cord blood units and the clinical outcomes of Network transplantations.

Requires the Administrator to report to the Secretary regarding the safety, efficacy, and cost-effectiveness of the clinical, research, and education activities of the Network.

Requires the Board to ensure that: (1) the Network donor banks meet confidentiality and privacy requirements; and (2) the Network and their birthing hospital collection sites are geographically distributed throughout the United States.