Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/19/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/20/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/14/2006