There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Care Access and Rural Equity (H-CARE) Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to protect and preserve access of Medicare beneficiaries in rural areas to health care providers under the Medicare Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/06/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/25/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/06/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2006Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 09/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/13/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/21/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/05/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/05/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/06/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/25/2006 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/06/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6030.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6030. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/06/2006)

Health Care Access and Rural Equity (H-CARE) Act of 2006 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act with respect to: (1) the Medicare disproportionate share hospital (DSH) adjustment for rural hospitals; (2); payment for clinical laboratory tests furnished by critical access hospitals; (3) rebasing for sole community hospitals; (4) establishment of a rural community hospital program; (5) extension of the Medicare rural hospital hold harmless provision under the prospective payment system (PPS) for hospital outpatient department services; (6) coverage of marriage and family therapist services and mental health counselor services under Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance); (7) permanent treatment of certain physician pathology services under Medicare; (8) extension of the Medicare incentive payment program for a physician scarcity area; (9) proportional representation of interests of rural areas on the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission; and (10) additional payments for providers furnishing ambulance services in rural areas and prompt payment of clean claims by Medicare prescription drug plans and MedicareAdvantage-Prescription Drug (MA-PD) plans under the Medicare part D (Voluntary Prescription Drug Benefit Program).

Amends the Medicare Prescription Drug, Improvement, and Modernization Act of 2003 to extend: (1) certain Medicare hospital wage index reclassifications and disregarding hospital reclassifications for purposes of group reclassifications; (2) Medicare reasonable costs payments for certain clinical diagnostic laboratory tests furnished to hospital patients in certain rural areas; and (3) the temporary Medicare payment increase for home health services furnished in a rural area.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to: (1) authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award competitive grants to eligible entities in rural areas for purchase and enhanced utilization of qualified health information technology systems; (2) establish a capital infrastructure revolving loan program and a Rural Health Quality Advisory Commission; and (3) provide for delta rural disparities and health systems development.