Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 09/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/06/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/13/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/21/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/05/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/05/2006