Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/26/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/14/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/06/2006