Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/07/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/12/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/27/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/27/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/27/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/27/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/27/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/05/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/05/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/05/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/06/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/06/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/07/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/07/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/07/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/07/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/08/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/08/2006