Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/12/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/14/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/14/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/14/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/19/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/19/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/19/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/25/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/25/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/25/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/25/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/25/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/25/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/25/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/25/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/25/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/27/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/27/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/27/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/27/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/05/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 12/05/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/05/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/05/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/05/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/05/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/05/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/05/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 12/05/2006