Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/18/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-407.
12/18/2006 Signed by President.
12/11/2006 Presented to President.
12/06/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2006 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11376)
09/28/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7887)
09/14/2006 Introduced in House