Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/19/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/19/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/20/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/20/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2006