Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2005