Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 09/19/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/19/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/19/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/21/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/26/2006