Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/10/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/21/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2005