There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Thomas J. Manton Prostate Cancer Early Detection and Treatment Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act and title XIX of the Social Security Act to provide for a screening and treatment program for prostate cancer in the same manner as is provided for breast and cervical cancer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/02/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/21/2006Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/21/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/21/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/21/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/21/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/27/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/27/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/27/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/14/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/05/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/21/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/02/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6135.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/21/2006)

Thomas J. Manton Prostate Cancer Early Detection and Treatment Act of 2006 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to allow the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), to make grants to states to carry out: (1) prostate cancer prevention programs (including screening and referrals for treatment); and (2) demonstration projects to provide preventive health services with respect to prostate cancer (including blood pressure and cholesterol screenings).

Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to allow states to provide medical assistance to individuals who have been screened for prostate cancer under this Act and who need treatment for prostate cancer.

Applies provisions related to breast and cervical cancer programs to programs under this Act.