Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/21/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/21/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/21/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/21/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/27/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/27/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/27/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/14/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/05/2006