Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/13/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/13/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/13/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/13/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/13/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/14/2006