Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/10/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/10/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/17/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/02/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/12/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/26/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/12/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/25/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/17/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/07/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/29/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/06/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/15/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/24/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/24/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/20/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/27/2006