Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/15/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/28/2006