Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/26/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/27/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/27/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/27/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/27/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/27/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/27/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/27/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/28/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/13/2006