Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 09/26/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 09/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/26/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/27/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/29/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/29/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/29/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/29/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/29/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/29/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/08/2006