Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/17/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/12/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew