Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/08/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/13/2005