Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/08/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/13/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/13/2006