Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/08/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/08/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/11/2006