Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/25/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/25/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/01/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/10/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/22/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/22/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/22/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/22/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/14/2006