Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/03/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2006