Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2006