Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/29/2006