Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/04/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 01/06/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/06/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/25/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/25/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/25/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/25/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/25/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 01/25/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/25/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/25/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/25/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/25/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/25/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/25/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/25/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 01/25/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/26/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/01/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/02/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/09/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/10/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/15/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/14/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/19/2005